+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
- Favorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 01/13/16, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
On January 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor