+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
- House sustained Governor's veto
On April 9, 2000 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1399ER)
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 36-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (58-Y 36-N)
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (28-Y 11-N)
- Amendment by Sen. Mims agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (28-Y 11-N)
On February 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
- Reconsidered by General Laws
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (6-Y 6-N 1-A)
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 7, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 005553760-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (25-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 005553760
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 36-N)
February 29, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (28-Y 11-N)
February 24, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: Reported from General Laws with amd (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
February 16, 2000: Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (6-Y 6-N 1-A)
February 8, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2000: Reported from General Laws with amd (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor