+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802)
- Enacted, Chapter 802 (effective 7/1/09)
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2112ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2112ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 093422740-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2112H1
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 093422740-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Standards of Quality
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 091116740
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 8, 2009: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 8, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2009: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2009: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor