+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (63)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- House sustained Governor's veto
- Motion to override Governor's veto rejected (55-Y 43-N)
- VOTE: (55-Y 43-N)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB478ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (32-Y 7-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (32-Y 7-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute accepted by conference committee
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (71-Y 19-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 19-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (7-Y 89-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (7-Y 89-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Diamonstein, Van Landingham, Devolites
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Woods, Hawkins, Lucas
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 986868204-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 986868204-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (26-Y 13-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (26-Y 13-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed 986868204-S1
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 39-N)
- Read third time and passed House (60-Y 39-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Motion for pending question
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Amendment by Mr. Wilkins rejected (42-Y 55-N)
- Read second time
- Amendments # 1,2,4 & 5 by Mr. Marshall rejected
- Amendment # 3 by Mr. Marshall rejected
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (59-Y 39-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (42-Y 55-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House (59-Y 39-N)
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Education (13-Y 9-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 1
On January 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 984386204
- Consent to introduce
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (55-Y 43-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (32-Y 7-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 19-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (7-Y 89-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (26-Y 13-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 39-N)
February 14, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (42-Y 55-N)
February 14, 1998: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (59-Y 39-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Education (13-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor