+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 627 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1207ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 16103440D