+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.84
On November 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.642
- Substituted For A10387a
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1712
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 9177b
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 9177a
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 31, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1