+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (5)
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Substituted by A986 (1R)
On December 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (2)
December 21, 2015: r/Sca
- Yeas: 13
March 17, 2014: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5