+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-13)
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (49-28-0)
- Substituted for A213 (2R)
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (23-14)
On December 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (6)
June 29, 2015: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
June 25, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 3
June 25, 2015: SUBSTITUTE FOR A213 AcaA
- Present/NV: 80
June 15, 2015: r/Aca
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 16, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
December 8, 2014: r/favorably
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor