+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2015, c.184.
On December 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0)
- Substituted for A4270
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (39-0)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
+ − Votes (6)
December 3, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 79
December 3, 2015: SUBSTITUTE FOR A4270
- Present/NV: 79
March 19, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
March 16, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13
February 9, 2015: r/SCS
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor