+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (4)
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by S2044 (2R)
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On October 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
+ − Votes (2)
June 13, 2019: r/Aca
- Yeas: 11
April 12, 2018: SUB FOR A3502
- Present/NV: 79
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor