+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.26
- Signed Chap.628
- Delivered To Governor
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1923
- Substituted For S6486d
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.84
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.84
On March 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On March 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7389c
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On October 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7389b
- Amend And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
On June 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7389a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Environmental Conservation
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Banks
+ − Vote
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 28
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor