+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB858ER)
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 32-N)
- Passed House (68-Y 32-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from N. & C. (5-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Nominations and Confirmations
- Read first time
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (21-Y 17-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N)
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (7-Y 6-N)
On January 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 977477635
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 32-N)
February 14, 1997: Reported from N. & C. (5-Y 2-N)
January 27, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (21-Y 17-N)
January 23, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1997: Reported from General Laws (7-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor