+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On March 11, 2006 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- No further action taken
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stolle, Norment, Cuccinelli
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Delegates: Suit, Athey, Joannou
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (3-Y 95-N)
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB94S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 064666820-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 064666820-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossment reconsidered by House (62-Y 30-N)
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 062873520-H1
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment by Delegate Joannou agreed to (50-Y 47-N)
- VOTE: (50-Y 47-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB94EH1
- VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (62-Y 30-N)
- Amendment by Delegate Joannou reconsidered (55-Y 40-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (55-Y 40-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment by Delegate Joannou agreed to (51-Y 45-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (51-Y 45-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB94EH1
- Printed as engrossed 062873520-EH1
On February 11, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 062873520-H1
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 4-N)
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
On December 19, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 065282140
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
March 9, 2006: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N)
March 9, 2006: VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (51-Y 45-N)
February 13, 2006: VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (55-Y 40-N)
February 13, 2006: VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (62-Y 30-N)
February 13, 2006: VOTE: (50-Y 47-N)
February 10, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor