+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0094)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 94 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2108ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2108H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 090911728-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 090911728-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 098338728
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2009: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2009: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor