+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (14-Y 6-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 15104676D-S2 (Obenshain)
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1061S2
- Committee substitute rejected 15104321D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator Obenshain agreed to 15104676D-S2
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 15104321D-S1
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100744D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 13, 2015: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (14-Y 6-N)
February 12, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 29, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor