+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 651 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB794ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Civil & Property Law
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 984441400-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from S. T. w/amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Presented & ordered printed 984441400
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1998: Reported from S. T. w/amds. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor