+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0990)
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2453ER2)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (97-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
- Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
- Placed on Calendar
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 990 (effective 4/2/03)
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2453ER)
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 033465880-H1
- Amendment by Del. Louderback rejected
- Committee substitute agreed to 033465880-H1
- Read second time
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 033465880-H1
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 030300880
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
April 2, 2003: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
April 2, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
February 20, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2003: Reported from C. & L. with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
January 30, 2003: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor