+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (55)
On April 11, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1193)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1193 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1526ER)
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 45-N 1-A)
- Conference report agreed to by House (53-Y 45-N 1-A)
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators: McClellan, Saslaw, Spruill, Norment, Vogel
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Sullivan, Lopez, Killgore
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference substitute printed 20109763D-H2
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute with amendments (29-Y 11-N)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (8-Y 88-N)
- Senate substitute with amendments rejected by House 20109059D-S1 (8-Y 88-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendments by Senator DeSteph agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 20109059D-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB1526S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (23-Y 17-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (24-Y 16-N)
- Amendments by Senator Chafin agreed to
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20109059D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 3-N)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
- Read third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107849D-H1
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 20107849D-EH1
- Amendments #'s 2-4, 6-8, 10, 13-14, 16-20 by Delegate Sullivan agreed to
- Amendments #'s 1, 5, 9, 11-12 and 15 by Delegate Sullivan agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1526EH1
On February 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20107849D-H1
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Presented and ordered printed 20105072D
+ − Impact Statements (5)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (12)
March 7, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 45-N 1-A)
March 7, 2020: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N)
March 4, 2020: Senate insisted on substitute with amendments (29-Y 11-N)
March 3, 2020: VOTE: REJECTED (8-Y 88-N)
February 27, 2020: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (23-Y 17-N)
February 27, 2020: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (24-Y 16-N)
February 27, 2020: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2020: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 3-N)
February 11, 2020: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
February 6, 2020: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
February 4, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Richard C. "Rip" Sullivan, Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor