+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
On April 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 466 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB224ER)
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (37-Y 1-N 1-A)
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 967728681-H1
- Read third time
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 967728681-H1
- Read third time
On February 21, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 967728681-H1
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Amendment by Mr. Stolle agreed to
- Amendment by Mr. Stolle rejected
- Reading of amendments waived
- Printed as engrossed 960631681-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate (26-Y 11-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (26-Y 11-N 1-A)
- Communicated to House
On February 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (40-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N)
On January 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 960631681
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (37-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1996: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (26-Y 11-N 1-A)
January 31, 1996: VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 30, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1996: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor