+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0217)
On March 16, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 217 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB352ER)
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On January 29, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 6-N)
On January 26, 1996 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 964465466-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 964465466
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1996: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
January 24, 1996: Reported from P. & E. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor