+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 12, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
On April 6, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 687 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 19, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB802ER)
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 965422114-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 965422114-S1
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 965422114-S1
- Reported from P. & E. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 965384114-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 1
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 965384114
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1996: Reported from P. & E. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1996: Reported from P. & E. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor