+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0783)
On April 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB317ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 783 (effective-see bill)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB317ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N)
- Passed House with substitute (96-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 988791825-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 988791825-H1
- Read third time
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 2-N)
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 988791825-H1
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 988404739-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 988404739-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 988404739-S1
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal
On January 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 988613825
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (39-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 2-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor