+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 19104813D-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1013ES1
- Printed as engrossed 19104813D-ES1
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
On August 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100084D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 11, 2019: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N)
January 25, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
January 23, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2019: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 1-N)
January 14, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor