+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 562 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1367ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 14-N)
- Passed House (78-Y 14-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (19-Y 3-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1367S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105128D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19105128D-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 3-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102933D