+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0898)
On May 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB200ER2)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 3-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB200ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 898 (effective 7/1/06)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0898)
On April 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 27, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB200ER)
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB200H2
- Read third time
- Committee substitute from Courts of Justice agreed to 069050740-H2
- Committee substitute from ACNR rejected 069041740-H1
- Passed House with substitute (93-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N)
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 069050740-H2
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Committee substitute printed 069041740-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB200S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 069016740-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 069016740-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 069451740
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 3-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2006: VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N)
March 3, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2006: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor