+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 15, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0854)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB843ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 854 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB843ER)
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment rejected
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Forbes agreed to 986851657
- Floor substitute printed 986851657-S1 (Forbes)
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 986851657
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 986805388-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 986805388
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1998: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor