+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On November 29, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On November 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up Cancellation filed in the Office of Secretary
On October 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On October 7, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0963 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On September 23, 2022 in the Council:
- PR24-0963 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor