+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 2, 2014 in the Council:
- Resolution Number R20-0699 Effective from Dec 2, 2014
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0699
- Final Reading CC
On November 25, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-0906
On July 14, 2014 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Economic Development
On July 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0906 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 25, 2014 in the Council:
- PR20-0906 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
December 2, 2014: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor