+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 17, 2015 in the Council:
- Resolution R21-0051 Effective from Mar 17, 2015, Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 4767
On March 17, 2015 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R21-0051
- Final Reading CC
On March 11, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Committee Mark-up of PR21-0085
On March 6, 2015 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR21-0085
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0085 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 3, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
On February 26, 2015 in the Council:
- PR21-0085 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
March 17, 2015: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor