+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Resolution R24-0626, Effective from Oct 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012733
On October 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0626
On September 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On September 27, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On September 26, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR24-0766
On September 8, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On July 13, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR24-0766 View Public Hearing Record
On June 10, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0766 Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 9, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On June 7, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On May 26, 2022 in the Council:
- PR24-0766 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
October 4, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor