+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 13, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR24-0765 View Public Hearing Record
On July 11, 2022 in the Council:
- Withdrawn
On June 10, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0765 Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 9, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On June 7, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On May 25, 2022 in the Council:
- PR24-0765 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor