+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 15, 2022 in the Council:
- Resolution R24-0509, Effective from Jun 28, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008400
On June 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0509
On June 22, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On June 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Mark-up on PR24-0644
- Committee Mark-up of PR24-0644
On June 17, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On May 23, 2022 in the Council:
- Roundtable on PR24-0644 View Roundtable Record
On May 13, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable filed in the Office of Secretary
On April 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On April 1, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0644 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 21, 2022 in the Council:
- PR24-0644 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 28, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor