+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2014 in the Council:
- Resolution R20-0424 Effective from Mar 4, 2014, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 2039
On March 6, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On March 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0424
- Final Reading, CC
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-0605
On February 25, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR20-0605
On January 17, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 7, 2014 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On December 27, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0605 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On December 17, 2013 in the Council:
- PR20-0605 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
March 4, 2014: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor