+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 11, 2022 in the Council:
- Resolution R24-0377, Effective from Feb 01, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 001061
On February 1, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0377
On January 18, 2022 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Transportation and the Environment, and Committee on Business and Economic Development
On January 10, 2022 in the Council:
- PR24-0551 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
February 1, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: No
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Recused
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor