+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 14, 2022 in the Council:
- Resolution R24-0349, Effective from Jan 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000241
On January 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0349
On December 15, 2021 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR24-0486
- Committee Report Filed
On December 10, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0486 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On December 7, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On November 30, 2021 in the Council:
- PR24-0486 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
January 4, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Absent
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor