+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 15, 2013 in the Council:
- Resolution R20-0324 Effective from Nov 5, 2013, Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 15804
On November 5, 2013 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0324
- Final Reading
On October 31, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 30, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-0477
On October 23, 2013 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR20-0477 View Video :
On October 4, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0477 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
On September 27, 2013 in the Council:
- PR20-0477 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 5, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor