+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 16, 2013 in the Council:
- Withdrawn
On November 26, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 29, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-0476
On October 22, 2013 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR20-0476 View Video :
On October 4, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0476 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Economic Development
On September 27, 2013 in the Council:
- PR20-0476 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor