+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 27, 2019 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0291, Effective from Dec 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16513
On December 17, 2019 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0291
- Legislative Meeting
On December 11, 2019 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of PR23-0463
On December 4, 2019 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR23-0463 View Public Hearing Record
On October 25, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 8, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On October 4, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0463 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 27, 2019 in the Council:
- PR23-0463 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
December 17, 2019: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor