+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On October 26, 2021 in the Council:
- Roundtable on PR24-0326
- Public Hearing on PR24-0326 View Public Hearing Record
On September 10, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 3, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On August 30, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable filed in the Office of Secretary
On July 16, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0326 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 13, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On July 1, 2021 in the Council:
- PR24-0326 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor