+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 17, 2019 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0091, Effective from May 07, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6108
On May 7, 2019 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0091
- Legislative Meeting
On May 1, 2019 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Committee Mark-up of PR23-0200
On April 10, 2019 in the Council:
- Roundtable on PR23-0200
On April 5, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 2, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
On March 29, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0200 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 21, 2019 in the Council:
- PR23-0200 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
May 7, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor