+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 23, 2013 in the Council:
- Resolution R20-0230 Effective from Jul 10, 2013, Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 12187
On July 10, 2013 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0230
- Final Reading
On July 3, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On July 2, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-0185
On June 3, 2013 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR20-0185
On April 30, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On April 26, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 12, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0185 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 8, 2013 in the Council:
- PR20-0185 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
July 10, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor