+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 23, 2021 in the Council:
- Resolution R24-0182, Effective from Jul 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 007158
On July 13, 2021 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0182
On July 7, 2021 in the Council:
- Mark-up on PR24-0184
- Committee Mark-up of PR24-0184
- Committee Report Filed
On July 6, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On April 23, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0184 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 20, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On April 19, 2021 in the Council:
- PR24-0184 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
July 13, 2021: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor