+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 14, 2021 in the Council:
- Resolution R24-0095, Effective from May 04, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 005151
On May 4, 2021 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0095
On April 6, 2021 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Transportation and the Environment
- Legislative Meeting
On March 16, 2021 in the Council:
- PR24-0125 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
May 4, 2021: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor