+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 17, 2014 in the Council:
- Resolution Number R20-0730 Effective from Dec 17, 2014
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0730
- Final Reading CC
- Committee Report Filed
On December 16, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-1124
On December 11, 2014 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR20-1124
On November 18, 2014 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On November 14, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-1124 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 5, 2014 in the Council:
- PR20-1124 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
December 17, 2014: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor