+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 26, 2021 in the Council:
- Roundtable on PR24-0110 View Roundtable Record
On March 12, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 5, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0110 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 3, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable filed in the Office of Secretary
On March 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On February 24, 2021 in the Council:
- PR24-0110 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor