+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 19, 2014 in the Council:
- Resolution R20-0683 Effective from Nov 18, 2014, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12734
On December 15, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 18, 2014 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0683
- Second Reconsideration
- First Reconsideration
- Final Reading CC
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-1062
On October 24, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 10, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-1062 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 7, 2014 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On September 30, 2014 in the Council:
- PR20-1062 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (3)
November 18, 2014: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
November 18, 2014: First Reconsideration
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
November 18, 2014: Second Reconsideration
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor