+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 23, 2022 in the Council:
- Resolution R24-0706, Effective from Dec 06, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 015342
On December 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0706
On December 2, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On December 1, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On November 29, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR24-1053
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On November 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Roundtable on PR24-1053 View Roundtable Record
- Notice of Mark-up Cancellation filed in the Office of Secretary
On November 18, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-1053 Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Roundtable Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 15, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
- Notice of Roundtable filed in the Office of Secretary
On November 10, 2022 in the Council:
- PR24-1053 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
On October 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
December 6, 2022: Waiver Council Rule 203
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Absent
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
December 6, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Absent
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor