+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2018 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R22-0627
- Resolution R22-0627 Effective from Nov 30, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13164
On November 5, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 16, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR22-0995
- Final Reading CC
On September 21, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0995 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 18, 2018 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On September 17, 2018 in the Council:
- PR22-0995 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
October 16, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor