+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On November 20, 2020 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0582, Effective from Nov 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13461
On November 10, 2020 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0582
- Legislative Meeting
On October 20, 2020 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Facilities and Procurement, and Committee on Recreation and Youth Affairs
On October 8, 2020 in the Council:
- PR23-0992 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 10, 2020: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Absent
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor