+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 23, 2018 in the Council:
- Resolution R22-0643 Effective from Nov 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13002
On November 13, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
- Approved with Resolution Number R22-0643
On November 6, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 5, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR22-0979
On October 22, 2018 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR22-0979
On September 28, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 21, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0979 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 18, 2018 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
On September 17, 2018 in the Council:
- PR22-0979 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 13, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor